TOTNES MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 296684
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 07 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 04 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)