SIMPSON'S TRUST

Charity number: 505554
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)