SOUTH HAMS SOCIETY

Charity number: 263985
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 November 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 December 2016 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)