THE ELIZABETH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 293835
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 26 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 13 October 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)