THE EVELYN OLDFIELD UNIT

Charity number: 1044681
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 July 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 20 May 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 20 May 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)