PostScript 360 Limited

Charity number: 1056508
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

( These accounts
have been qualified)

11 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 20 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 18 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)