ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF BIRDS

Charity number: 207076
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 20 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 20 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)