THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 212992
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 10 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 10 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 05 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 05 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 16 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 16 May 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)