THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN OF JERUSALEM (THE ORDER OF ST JOHN)

Charity number: 235979
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 04 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)