CABMEN'S SHELTER FUND

Charity number: 236108
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)