ESTA STRING TEACHERS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 266193
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 09 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 November 2019 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 13 November 2019 106 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 13 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

13 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 05 September 2016 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 05 September 2016 37 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)