THE RESEARCH INTO LOST KNOWLEDGE ORGANISATION TRUST

Charity number: 266677
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2020 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2016 27 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)