THE HOWARD DE WALDEN CENTRE

Charity number: 268203
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

10 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)