THE CLOTHWORKERS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274100
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 02 September 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 02 September 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)