WILLIAM JOHN MILLS COTTAGES

Charity number: 275488
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 24 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 24 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2015 12 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 12 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)