DOMINICA OVERSEA NATIONALS ASSOCIATION AID - DOMINICA DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 279643
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not yet received
629 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 08 June 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)