OXFORD THEATRE GUILD

Charity number: 294056
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 April 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)