HEATH END VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 301735
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 15 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)