BUILDING CRAFTS COLLEGE

Charity number: 312856
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 17 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018

( These accounts
have been qualified)

17 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 29 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 08 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 08 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 05 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 05 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)