THE KARUNA TRUST

Charity number: 327461
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)