INTERCOUNTRY ADOPTION CENTRE

Charity number: 1067313
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 17 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)