THE CHRISTIAN CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1071039
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 03 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 05 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 05 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 09 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 09 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)