THE ROMEERA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1076325
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2015 09 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)