SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED INFECTION RESEARCH FOUNDATION (STIRF)

Charity number: 1075316
Charity reporting is 268 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not yet received
268 days overdue
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 March 2019 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 08 February 2017 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 01 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)