MECHANICS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1086333
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 May 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)