IVY STREET FAMILY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1088854
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 07 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)