THE EXETER & DISTRICT CLASSICAL MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1090945
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 24 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 12 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 21 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 01 August 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)