VICTORIA PARK HARRIERS AND TOWER HAMLETS AC

Charity number: 1091712
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 19 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 19 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)