NORWICH INTERNATIONAL YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1099039
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 31 October 2016 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 31 October 2016 123 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)