BRIDGETOWN ALIVE

Charity number: 1103636
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 26 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)