FRONT LINE EMERGENCY EQUIPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1107582
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 05 September 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 05 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 05 October 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)