HINDU WELFARE ASSOCIATION OF ESSEX

Charity number: 1111503
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

( These accounts
have been qualified)

13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

01 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 01 December 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 28 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 28 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)