RUSHMOOR CONCERT BAND

Charity number: 1111990
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 10 February 2020 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 29 December 2017 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 08 January 2017 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)