ACTIVE LIGHTWORKS LTD

Charity number: 1114800
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 01 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 02 February 2017 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2015 04 February 2016 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)