UNDER TREE SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1117679
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

( These accounts
have been qualified)

09 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

( These accounts
have been qualified)

17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

24 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)