BILLINGSHURST EMERGENCY ASSISTANCE TEAM

Charity number: 1119641
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 06 December 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 16 March 2019 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 09 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2015 17 June 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)