KIDZ KLUB BRIGHTON & HOVE

Charity number: 1126869
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 September 2020 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 September 2020 90 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 09 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 21 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 29 July 2016 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 29 July 2016 29 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)