SOUTH HARFORD & TUCKSWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126830
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

01 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

27 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 01 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

( These accounts
have been qualified)

01 February 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)