THE WEST ESSEX ALCOHOL AND DRUGS SERVICE

Charity number: 1129267
Charity reporting is 271 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not yet received
271 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not yet received
271 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 21 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)