THE GROW OLD DISGRACEFULLY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1131498
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 June 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 August 2019 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 13 August 2018 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 15 May 2017 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 17 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)