HILLINGDON STREET ANGELS

Charity number: 1140000
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)