THREE TREES COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1140924
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 18 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 March 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 01 June 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 01 June 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)