THE KACHIN RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 1148586
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

28 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

26 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 17 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

( These accounts
have been qualified)

17 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)