THE CANCER AND BIRTH DEFECTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149441
Charity reporting is 181 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 Not yet received
181 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not yet received
181 days overdue
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 October 2019 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 17 August 2018 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 02 June 2017 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 25 August 2016 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)