THE BETTY MESSENGER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149282
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 15 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 15 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 31 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 22 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 22 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2015 29 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 29 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)