BLIND DOG RESCUE UK

Charity number: 1148828
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)