BOXING4LIFE

Charity number: 1155607
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 14 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 14 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)