MISS ISLE SCHOOL OF SIP & PUFF SAILING

Charity number: 1162550
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 July 2019 25 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2019 25 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 06 July 2018 03 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2018 03 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 06 July 2017 02 October 2018 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2017 27 September 2018 144 days late Download
Annual return 06 July 2016 10 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2016 10 March 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)