360 GIVING

Charity number: 1164883
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)