PRIDE IN ELY CIO

Charity number: 1170817
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 February 2019 13 January 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2019 13 January 2020 41 days late Download
Annual return 03 February 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2018 03 November 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)